Global Patent Index - EP 0784251 B1

EP 0784251 B1 2000-05-03 - Device for connecting a band to a watch case

Title (en)

Device for connecting a band to a watch case

Title (de)

Anschlussvorrichtung für ein Uhrarmband

Title (fr)

Agencement de fixation d'un bracelet sur une montre

Publication

EP 0784251 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400063 A

Priority

FR 9600371 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0784251A1] The attachment for fixing a bracelet to a watch comprises two side flanks (2,3) which includes sockets (33,34) to receive the ends of two bars (11,12) which carry the ends of the watch bracelet (14). The two side flanks are intended to fit along either side of the rectangular watch casing (1) . Additional elements (16,17,24) lie between the watch casing (1) and the side flanks in order to attach the components together. The outer elements of the mounting (24) are received in recesses formed within the side flanks. These assemblies are held together with a series of pins (18,23) in order to allow a pivoting movement when the watch is inserted within the outer frame defined by the two side flanks.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 37/16; G04B 47/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/14 (2006.01); G04B 37/14 (2006.01); G04B 47/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 47/046 (2013.01); G04B 37/1486 (2013.01); Y10T 24/2155 (2013.01); Y10T 24/2166 (2013.01); Y10T 24/4782 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0784251 A1 19970716; EP 0784251 B1 20000503; DE 69701816 D1 20000608; DE 69701816 T2 20001207; FR 2743640 A1 19970718; FR 2743640 B1 19980403; JP H09289909 A 19971111; US 5720085 A 19980224

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-08-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050114

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050114

2005-01-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050114

2004-01-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040122

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-01-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040119

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-01-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040114

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000807

2000-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2000-07-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701816 20000608

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

1999-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990305

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971230

1997-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI