Global patent index - EP 0784297 A3

EP 0784297 A3 2000-01-12 - Toll collection system capable of properly collecting a toll from a user without requiring any special equipment to be mounted in a vehicle

Title (en)

Toll collection system capable of properly collecting a toll from a user without requiring any special equipment to be mounted in a vehicle

Title (de)

Mautgebühreneinzugssystem, das fähig ist, eine Mautgebühr ordnungsgemäss ohne irgendeine spezielle im Fahrzeug eingebaute Vorrichtung von einem Benutzer einzuziehen

Title (fr)

Système de perception de droits de péage capable de percevoir correctement une taxe d'un utilisateur sans nécessiter aucun équipment particulier monté dans un véhicule

Publication

EP 0784297 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97100354 A

Priority

JP 291896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0784297A2] A mobile terminal (20) for mobile communication transmits a radio signal carrying a terminal number and a particular dial number. Each toll lane (12) of a tollgate is provided with an antenna (121) for receiving the radio signal and a vehicle's class detector (122) for detecting the vehicle's class of an automotive vehicle (11). Each tollgate is provided with a terminal information receiving unit (13) and an interface circuit (16). Responsive to the radio signal from the antenna (121), the interface circuit (16) identifies as lane information an entry lane which the automotive vehicle (11) is entering and acquires terminal information corresponding to the terminal number by accessing the mobile communication exchange system (30). The terminal information receiving unit (13) receives the lane information and the terminal information for transmission to a data memory unit (14). On the other hand, the processing unit (17) acquires vehicle's class information from the vehicle's class detector (122). The processing unit (17) then prepares and stores in the data memory unit (14) passage car information containing the lane information, the terminal information, the vehicle's class information, and a passage time. A central processing computer (15) obtains from every tollgate vehicle passage data including the passage vehicule information and tollgate information to prepare toll charge data. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 15/00 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 15/063 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0784297 A2 19970716; EP 0784297 A3 20000112; CA 2194826 A1 19970712; JP H09190554 A 19970722

INPADOC legal status

2002-07-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011227

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010813

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000505

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

1997-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE