Global Patent Index - EP 0784332 B1

EP 0784332 B1 2000-11-29 - Single-ended low pressure discharge lamp and associated fitting

Title (en)

Single-ended low pressure discharge lamp and associated fitting

Title (de)

Einseitig gesockelte Niederdruckentladungslampe und zugehörige Fassung

Title (fr)

Lampe à décharge à basse pression à culot unique et douille correspondante

Publication

EP 0784332 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97100073 A

Priority

DE 29600594 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: JPH09199003A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To provide a single-base low-pressure discharge lamp having a base of compact, flat and simple constitution which enables easy and quick installation of the lamp and further enables equipment of a luminaire as needed, and provide a socket therefor. SOLUTION: A circular fluorescent lamp 1 includes a discharge tube 2 formed in a plane and a base 3 having contact pins 8a, 8b; 9a, 9b. In the base 3 both ends of the discharge tube 2 are positioned opposite to each other. The contact pins 8a, 8b; 9a, 9b are disposed approximately in a circular plane of the lamp 1 and on both sides of the base 3. A socket as an attachment has a U-shaped sectional area. The foot of the socket has cavities for receiving the contact pins and for making electrical contact therewith.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 5/56; H01J 61/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 5/50 (2006.01); H01J 5/56 (2006.01); H01J 61/32 (2006.01); H01R 33/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/322 (2013.01); H01J 5/565 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29600594 U1 19970507; EP 0784332 A1 19970716; EP 0784332 B1 20001129; JP 3854354 B2 20061206; JP H09199003 A 19970731; KR 100442890 B1 20040918; TR 199700015 A2 19970821; US 5789849 A 19980804

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702675

2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140103

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140103

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140103

2014-08-20 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PATENT-TREUHAND-G.- FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUHLAMPEN M.

- Effective date: 20140131

2013-10-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GMBH, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59702675

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130128

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130213

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-03-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM AG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59702675

- Effective date: 20130205

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120125

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-01-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59702675

- Effective date: 20111130

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702675 20010104

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000217

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970806

1997-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL