Global Patent Index - EP 0784334 B1

EP 0784334 B1 2000-05-03 - Metal halide lamp

Title (en)

Metal halide lamp

Title (de)

Metallhalogenidlampe

Title (fr)

Lampe à halogénures métalliques

Publication

EP 0784334 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96120431 A

Priority

US 58486996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0784334A1] A highly efficient discharge lamp (10) has a color rendering index greater than 75, a lumens per watt rating greater than 90, a correlated color temperature of between 3500 and 4040 DEG K, and a wall loading greater than 17 W/cm<2>. The lamp (10) comprises an outer glass envelope (12) and a pair of electrical conductors (26,28) extending thereinto. A quartz discharge tube (14) is disposed within the outer envelope (12) and includes a pair of spaced electrodes which are electrically connected to the electrical conductors (26,28) for creating an electrical discharge during operation of the lamp. The discharge tube (14) has an arc chamber or arc cavity with the configuration of a prolate spheroid having a major diameter and a given arc distance as measured by the linear distance between the interior terminations of the electrodes, the ratio of the major diameter to the arc distance being less than 1 and greater than 0.9. An arc generating and sustaining medium within the arc chamber comprises the halides of sodium, scandium, lithium, thulium, in a ratio of 48:1:10:16, and a thallium amalgam. A fill gas selected from argon and xenon, and a given quantity of mercury to achieve a desired lamp voltage completes the chemical dose. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/82; H01J 61/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/073 (2006.01); H01J 61/20 (2006.01); H01J 61/28 (2006.01); H01J 61/30 (2006.01); H01J 61/34 (2006.01); H01J 61/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/30 (2013.01); H01J 61/827 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0784334 A1 19970716; EP 0784334 B1 20000503; CA 2194724 A1 19970712; CN 1106671 C 20030423; CN 1165395 A 19971119; DE 69608089 D1 20000608; DE 69608089 T2 20000914; JP H09199080 A 19970731

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071218

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090220

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051208

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070102

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OSRAM SYLVANIA INC.

- Effective date: 20061231

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061218

2007-10-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-09-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070701

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061218

2007-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070701

2006-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-12-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051216

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-12-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20051212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-12-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051208

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-12-05 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20051205

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608089 20000608

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

1999-01-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981127

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970806

1997-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL