Global Patent Index - EP 0784607 A4

EP 0784607 A4 2000-03-15 - POLYMERIC VEHICLES WHICH INCLUDE A PHENOLIC URETHANE REACTIVE DILUENT

Title (en)

POLYMERIC VEHICLES WHICH INCLUDE A PHENOLIC URETHANE REACTIVE DILUENT

Title (de)

POLYMERENTRÄGER MIT REAKTIVEM, PHENOZISCHEM URETHANHALTIGEM VERDÜNNER

Title (fr)

VEHICULES POLYMERES RENFERMANT UN DILUANT REACTIF D'URETHANE PHENOLIQUE

Publication

EP 0784607 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96928096 A

Priority

  • US 9612915 W
  • US 206395 P
  • US 62117796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9706129A1] The present invention is directed to a polymeric vehicle, the formulated coating composition and a coating binder made from the polymeric vehicle and a method for making the polymeric vehicle where the polymeric vehicle includes a phenolic urethane reactive diluent. The phenolic urethane reactive diluent may be made from a phenolic ester alcohol having at least one aliphatic hydroxyl group.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 69/88; C07C 271/12; C07C 271/26; C08G 18/32; C08G 18/38; C08G 18/46; C08L 61/24; C08L 61/28; C08L 61/32; C08L 75/04; C08L 75/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07C 69/88 (2006.01); C07C 271/20 (2006.01); C07D 251/34 (2006.01); C07D 303/16 (2006.01); C08G 12/40 (2006.01); C08G 18/32 (2006.01); C08G 18/38 (2006.01); C08G 18/80 (2006.01); C08L 61/32 (2006.01); C09D 175/04 (2006.01); C09D 201/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09D 175/04 (2013.01); C07C 271/20 (2013.01); C07D 251/34 (2013.01); C08G 18/3221 (2013.01); C08G 18/3831 (2013.01); C08G 18/8067 (2013.01); C09D 201/06 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C09D 175/04 + C08L 2666/16
  2. C09D 201/06 + C08L 2666/28

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9706129 A1 19970220; AU 6768896 A 19970305; CA 2200082 A1 19970220; EP 0784607 A1 19970723; EP 0784607 A4 20000315; JP 2001516368 A 20010925; MX 9702546 A 19971031

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030301

2001-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL CHEMICAL PATENTS INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010329

2000-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 07C 69/88 A, 7C 07C 271/12 B, 7C 07C 271/26 B, 7C 08G 18/32 B, 7C 08G 18/38 B, 7C 08G 18/46 B, 7C 08L 61/24 B, 7C 08L 61/28 B, 7C 08L 61/32 B, 7C 08L 75/04 B, 7C 09D 175/04 B

2000-03-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970811

1997-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE