Global Patent Index - EP 0784809 B1

EP 0784809 B1 2002-09-11 - IMAGING APPARATUS AND INTERMEDIATE TRANSFER BLANKET THEREFOR

Title (en)

IMAGING APPARATUS AND INTERMEDIATE TRANSFER BLANKET THEREFOR

Title (de)

BILDERZEUGUNGSGERAET SOWIE ZWISCHENUEBERTRAGUNGSFOLIE

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'IMAGES ET BLANCHET DE TRANSFERT INTERMEDIAIRE ASSOCIE

Publication

EP 0784809 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95920290 A

Priority

  • IL 11184694 A
  • IL 11184794 A
  • NL 9500188 W
  • US 32153894 A
  • US 37111795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9611426A1] Imaging apparatus including an imaging surface having a toner image formed thereon and an intermediate transfer member (30, 102, 104), which receives the toner image from the imaging surface and from which it is subsequently transferred. The intermediate transfer member (30, 102, 104) includes a drum (30) having mounting recesses formed therein and an intermediate transfer blanket (104) mounted on the drum (30). The blanket (104) has a layered transfer portion having a transfer surface (109) on one face thereof which receives the toner image and optionally an adhesive layer (126) on the opposite face thereof and a mounting fixture (106), attached to one edge of the layered transfer portion and adapted to mate with the mounting recesses in the drum, whereby the transfer blanket (104) is fixedly and removably mounted on the drum (30).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/10 (2006.01); G03G 5/04 (2006.01); G03G 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 5/04 (2013.01); G03G 15/162 (2013.01); B41P 2227/70 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9611426 A1 19960418; AU 2578495 A 19960502; CA 2202270 A1 19960418; DE 69528188 D1 20021017; DE 69528188 T2 20030515; EP 0784809 A1 19970723; EP 0784809 B1 20020911; JP 2004171022 A 20040617; JP 2005122192 A 20050512; JP 3708547 B2 20051019; JP 3869442 B2 20070117; JP H10509525 A 19980914

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150605

2015-07-01 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150605

2015-06-06 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69528188

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-04-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD INDIGO B.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INDIGO N.V., MAASTRICHT, NL

- Document: DE 69528188

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-04-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69528188

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-04-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69528188

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT ANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB -, DE

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-02-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69528188

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080606

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070626

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-06-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD INDIGO B.V.

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69528188 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990728

1997-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970509

1997-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT