Global Patent Index - EP 0784943 B1

EP 0784943 B1 2003-06-04 - Skishoe

Title (en)

Skishoe

Title (de)

Schischuh

Title (fr)

Chaussure de ski

Publication

EP 0784943 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96890009 A

Priority

  • EP 96890009 A
  • US 29368194 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0784943A1] The outer shell of the ski boot comprises a foot part (2) and a leg part (3), connected by a joint (4). The leg part can be pivoted from a loose position to a locked skiing position, in which it can be fixed. An actuator (28) is provided for release from the locked position. A first clamp (30) holds the inner shoe (10) in the outer shell and the inner shoe is held against the sole of the outer shell in the skiing position by a second clamp (22). The inner shoe can be inserted into the outer shell through a rear flap (44) arranged pivotably on the foot part. The first clamp is formed by central rotating clamp and the second clamping system presses the first clamp on the instep of the inner shoe.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04; A43B 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A43B 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 11/02 (2013.01); A43B 5/0405 (2013.01); A43B 5/0435 (2013.01); A43B 5/048 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0784943 A1 19970723; EP 0784943 B1 20030604; US 6026596 A 20000222

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100117

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100117

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090128

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090128

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ARNOLD & SIEDSMA AG

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59610500 P 20030710

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-12-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001107

1998-03-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980123

1997-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI