Global Patent Index - EP 0784944 B1

EP 0784944 B1 2000-05-10 - Footwear for sporting purposes

Title (en)

Footwear for sporting purposes

Title (de)

Schuhwerk für Sportzwecke

Title (fr)

Ensemble chaussant pour la pratique du sport

Publication

EP 0784944 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96119599 A

Priority

FR 9600833 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0784944A1] The boot consists of an inner liner (2) in direct contact with the foot, and an outer cover (3) which is shaped to receive the inner and is joined to the skate. The components are linked by a lace which is passed round hooks (8) and through eyelets (7). Each of the two sections has an aperture (5, 6) for inserting the foot, and both are tightened at the same time by the lace, which criss-crosses on top of the wearer's foot.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/16; A43B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/00 (2006.01); A43B 5/16 (2006.01); A43B 7/14 (2006.01); A43C 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/16 (2013.01); A43B 5/00 (2013.01); A43B 7/1495 (2013.01); A43C 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0784944 A1 19970723; EP 0784944 B1 20000510; AT 192630 T 20000515; CA 2195502 A1 19970723; DE 69608232 D1 20000615; DE 69608232 T2 20001130; FR 2743730 A1 19970725; FR 2743730 B1 19980320; TW 343911 B 19981101; US 5909947 A 19990608

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-02-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2010-02-26 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081205

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-12-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051206

2001-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-11-08 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-08-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DOTT. GIOVANNI LECCE & C.

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608232 20000615

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-05-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192630 T 20000515

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990510

1998-03-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980108

1997-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI