Global Patent Index - EP 0784948 B1

EP 0784948 B1 2002-11-06 - Depilatory wax applicator with a retractable roller

Title (en)

Depilatory wax applicator with a retractable roller

Title (de)

Enthaarungswachsapplikator mit einziehbarer Rolle

Title (fr)

Applicateur de cire à épiler a rouleau rétractable

Publication

EP 0784948 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97105500 A

Priority

  • EP 94420171 A
  • FR 9307341 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0629366A1] - Application of hot-melt products. - The invention relates to an applicator for hot-melt products, in particular depilatory wax, including a casing (1) associated with a gripping means, a reservoir (2) for the product to be applied, made from a material which is a good conductor of heat, preferably made from aluminium, and which is in thermal communication with heating means (4), and at least one applicator roller (15) arranged in the vicinity of an output orifice of the reservoir (2), characterised in that: - the applicator roller (15) comprises a core (16) made from a material which is a good conductor of heat, the said core (16) being surrounded by an application layer (18) made from plastic material. - Applicator for depilatory wax. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 26/00; A45D 40/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 26/00 (2006.01); A45D 40/26 (2006.01); B05C 5/04 (2006.01); B05C 17/005 (2006.01); B05C 17/035 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/00523 (2013.01); A45D 26/0014 (2013.01); A45D 40/261 (2013.01); B05C 17/0357 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0629366 A1 19941221 - SEB SA [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0629366 A1 19941221; EP 0629366 B1 19980121; DE 69408037 D1 19980226; DE 69408037 T2 19980604; DE 69431674 D1 20021212; DE 69431674 T2 20030918; EP 0784948 A2 19970723; EP 0784948 A3 19990811; EP 0784948 B1 20021106; ES 2112500 T3 19980401; ES 2187693 T3 20030616; FR 2706261 A1 19941223; FR 2706261 B1 19950901; HK 1004322 A1 19981120; US 5556468 A 19960917; US 5681388 A 19971028; US 5846326 A 19981208

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070614

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *SEB

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060615

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060614

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-06-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060615

2006-06-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060614

2005-08-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050817

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050608

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-05-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050518

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-04-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050429

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187693 T3

2003-02-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030203

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69431674 20021212

2002-11-06 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 629366

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010313

1999-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990921

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

1999-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6A 45D 26/00 A, 6A 45D 40/26 B

1997-07-23 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 629366

1997-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT