Global Patent Index - EP 0785029 B1

EP 0785029 B1 2001-05-30 - Horizontal centrifuge for an optimum oil extraction

Title (en)

Horizontal centrifuge for an optimum oil extraction

Title (de)

Horizontale Zentrifuge für eine optimale Ölextraktion

Title (fr)

Centrifugeuse horizontale pour l'extraction optimale d'huile

Publication

EP 0785029 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97830001 A

Priority

  • IT RM960033 A
  • IT RM960314 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0785029A1] A horizontal centrifuge comprising a plurality of water outlet nozzles (1) which cross the inlet head (16) disposed on the oily slurry supply side, a plurality of oil outlet radial nozzles (15) arranged on the drum (3), a plurality of oil outlet radial nozzles (12) which are located downstream of the circular barrier (13) created by the supplied slurry, and a plurality of baffle plates (2, 7, 9) whose function is to form an uniterrupted oil column which does not mix with water and solids. In particular, the baffle plate (2) arranged upstream prevents oil to be discharged with water, and the central baffle plate (7) lets the oil pass through its apertures (21) and directs the muds towards the wall of the drum (3), separating them from the oil column (8) and moving them away from the inlet apertures of the nozzles (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B04B 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04B 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11B 1/06 (2013.01); B04B 1/20 (2013.01); B04B 2001/2041 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0785029 A1 19970723; EP 0785029 B1 20010530; DE 69704963 D1 20010705; DE 69704963 T2 20020124; ES 2158477 T3 20010901; GR 3036050 T3 20010928

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130110

2014-03-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140321

2013-11-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69704963

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130802

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-01 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20010400892

- Effective date: 20130802

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120228

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158477 T3

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704963 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GR

1999-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991025

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971125

1997-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GR