Global Patent Index - EP 0785134 B1

EP 0785134 B1 2001-12-05 - Method and apparatus for sanitizing filling machines and systems, particularly for food products

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for sanitizing filling machines and systems, particularly for food products

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Desinfizieren von Füllmaschinen- und Systemen,insbesondere für Lebensmittel

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour nettoyer des machines et systèmes de remplissage, en particulier pour des produits alimentaires

Publication

EP 0785134 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96202989 A

Priority

IT MI960059 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0785134A2] A method for sanitizing filling machines (111) and systems (11) in the food industry, for the purpose of reducing the microbic load, and the apparatus used for implementing this method. The main characteristic of the method of the present invention is that it uses a collection and drainage device (70) for the sanitizer liquid comprising a hollow cylinder (32) into which the liquid flows, a retention disc (31) arranged to hermetically seal the device (70) when it comes into contact with the cock (39) of the filling section (14), and a movable piston (34) arranged to close the cylinder (32) (and at the same time to open the inlet valve (24) for the sanitizer liquid) during liquid circulation, and to open the cylinder (32) during the draining of the liquid from a cup (26). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 55/02; B67C 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 55/02 (2006.01); B67C 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/004 (2013.01); B65B 55/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0785134 A2 19970723; EP 0785134 A3 19971210; EP 0785134 B1 20011205; AT 210047 T 20011215; DE 69617620 D1 20020117; DE 69617620 T2 20020808; ES 2167514 T3 20020516; IT 1281670 B1 19980226; IT MI960059 A1 19970717; IT MI960059 D0 19960116

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031027

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2003-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031027

2003-10-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031026

2003-06-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-11-01 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20021101

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021031

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021031

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021026

2002-10-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20021011

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021008

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2167514 T3

2002-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-03-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69617620 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL PT

2001-12-05 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210047 T 20011215

2000-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991119

1998-07-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980516

1997-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL PT

1997-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL PT