Global Patent Index - EP 0785296 B1

EP 0785296 B1 2000-03-15 - Electroplating of nickel on nickel ferrite devices

Title (en)

Electroplating of nickel on nickel ferrite devices

Title (de)

Elektroplattieren von Nickel auf Nickel-Ferrit Vorrichtungen

Title (fr)

Dépôt électrolytique de nickel sur des dispositifs en nickel ferrite

Publication

EP 0785296 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96309396 A

Priority

  • US 58107995 A
  • US 76918996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0785296A1] This invention is predicated on the discovery by the present applicants that boric acid in conventional nickel plating baths is responsible for excessive lateral growth in the electroplating of nickel on nickel ferrite substrates. While nickel baths without boric acid do not yield acceptable electrodeposits, the boric acid interacts with the ferrite substrate to cause excessive lateral growth. Applicants further discovered that by eliminating the boric acid and adding another acidic plating buffer such as citric acid, one can obtain isotropic nickel plating and produce a wire-bondable surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 5/18 (2006.01); C25D 3/12 (2006.01); C25D 5/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0785296 A1 19970723; EP 0785296 B1 20000315; DE 69607130 D1 20000420; DE 69607130 T2 20001019; JP H09310194 A 19971202; MX 9700180 A 19971231

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20031223

2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-12-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031223

2002-12-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021205

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021126

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021105

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69607130

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-20

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980910

1998-03-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980108

1997-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB