Global Patent Index - EP 0785315 B1

EP 0785315 B1 2000-06-28 - Cleaning and freshening unit intended for suspension from a rim of a toilet bowl

Title (en)

Cleaning and freshening unit intended for suspension from a rim of a toilet bowl

Title (de)

Reinigungs- und Erfrischungsvorrichtung zum Einhängen am Rand eines Toilettenbeckens

Title (fr)

Dispositif de nettoyage et de rafraîchissement déstiné à être accroché sous le rebord d'une cuvette de W.C.

Publication

EP 0785315 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96203280 A

Priority

NL 1001722 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0785315A1] A cleaning and freshening unit (1) provided with a holder (2) and a liquid reservoir (4) detachably connected to the holder (2), the unit being provided with means (5) for suspension from a rim of a toilet bowl, the unit (1) also being provided with a porous, liquid-absorbing mass (6) which always communicates with liquid (F) contained in the liquid reservoir (4), the holder (2) being provided with a connecting nipple (7) suitable for connection to a discharge opening (8) of the bottle (3), the discharge opening (8) of the bottle (3) when connected being partly closed by a closing wall (9) provided with at least one liquid passage opening (10) which opens into an inlet (11<a>) of a channel (11) abutting with an outlet (11<b>) having a limited surface against the porous mass (6), and provided with at least one air supply opening (12) communicating with the ambient pressure, the sizes of the liquid passage opening (10) and the air supply opening (12) being such that the liquid pressure on the porous mass (6) is always equal and independent of the liquid level in the liquid reservoir (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 9/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 9/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 9/032 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0785315 A1 19970723; EP 0785315 B1 20000628; AT 194186 T 20000715; AU 711453 B2 19991014; AU 711453 C 20040108; AU 7400796 A 19970529; DE 69609046 D1 20000803; DE 69609046 T2 20001026; DE 785315 T1 19990520; ES 2142777 T1 20000501; ES 2142777 T3 20001201; NL 1001722 C2 19970523; NZ 299791 A 19980826; PT 785315 E 20001031; SG 47196 A1 19980320; TW 314563 B 19970901; ZA 9609755 B 19970623

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161122

2017-02-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161120

2016-12-14 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161120

2016-11-23 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20161120

2016-11-21 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69609046

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151106

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151116

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121121

2011-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-07-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110523

2011-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SARA LEE/DE N.V.

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-05-27 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20110523

2011-04-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY, CINCINNATI, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SARA LEE/DE N.V., UTRECHT, NL

- Document: DE 69609046

- Effective date: 20110214

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101127

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-23 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-01-21 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2011-01-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091224

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-03-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20091109

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071122

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071121

2008-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-07-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SARA LEE/DE N.V.

- Free text: SARA LEE/DE N.V.#KEULSEKADE 143#3532 AA UTRECHT (NL) -TRANSFER TO- SARA LEE/DE N.V.#KEULSEKADE 143#3532 AA UTRECHT (NL)

2006-11-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20061114

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-11-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061114

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-11-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20061113

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-06-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20060127

2006-04-12 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20060127

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: S.C. JOHNSON & SON, INC.,

2001-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: JEYES DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2001-05-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: S.C. JOHNSON & SON, INC.,

- Effective date: 20000712

2001-05-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: JEYES DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20010312

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142777 T3

2000-11-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: S.C. JOHNSON & SON, INC.,

2000-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: S.C. JOHNSON & SON, INC.,

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-08-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69609046 20000803

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194186 T 20000715

2000-05-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142777 T1

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990813

1999-05-20 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1999-01-27 [111L] LICENCES

- Free text: 981116 0100 SARA LEE/DE FRANCE SNC

1999-01-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1999-01-04 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1998-12-18 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1997-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971024

1997-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE