Global Patent Index - EP 0785330 B1

EP 0785330 B1 2000-08-02 - Tailgate hinge for motor vehicles

Title (en)

Tailgate hinge for motor vehicles

Title (de)

Heckklappenanlenkung für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Charnière de rayon arrière pour véhicules automobiles

Publication

EP 0785330 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97100559 A

Priority

  • DE 29600658 U
  • DE 29600660 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19651692A1] The pivot link involved comprises a first pivot link half (1) fixed to the vehicle bodywork and a second pivot link half (2) fixed to the rear flap. The second pivot link half is formed by a somewhat swan neck-shaped curved hinge arm and both pivot link halves are joined to each other by a hinge bearing bolt. The fixed vehicle-side pivot link half is formed by a cast part which has two ribs (5) with through-holes (3) for a pivot bearing bolt (4). It has downwardly pointing protrusions (6), opposite to the ribs, which are arranged at a distance from the through-holes and from the pivot link bearing axis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/1057 (2013.01); E05D 11/1071 (2013.01); E05D 11/1085 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/531 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/546 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19651692 A1 19971106; EP 0785330 A2 19970723; EP 0785330 A3 19970730; EP 0785330 B1 20000802; ES 2151195 T3 20001216

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050116

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030117

2004-08-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2003-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-09-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-01-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030117

2003-01-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030117

2003-01-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030116

2002-01-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020118

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020102

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011226

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-12-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011214

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151195 T3

2000-10-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-09-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702094 20000907

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ED. SCHARWAECHTER GMBH

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990916

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1997-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970116

1997-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE