Global Patent Index - EP 0785335 B1

EP 0785335 B1 2002-11-13 - Holding device for glazing pane edge

Title (en)

Holding device for glazing pane edge

Title (de)

Glasrandhalterung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de support pour le bord d'un vitrage

Publication

EP 0785335 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97100439 A

Priority

DE 19601505 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0785335A1] A glass edge holder, especially for insulating multiple glazing of windows, doors or facades, comprises an L- or U-shaped profile (1) which has a peripheral abutment (3) at the weather side and which is releasably attached to an element of a window or door frame or a facade construction (5). The profile (1) comprises a high strength, low thermal conductivity plastic and has, at the face facing the end face of the glazing (2), a central recess which forms a water drainage channel (7) extending in the plane of the glazing, while the remainder of the face lies flush on the end face. The profile (1) is provided with drainage holes (9) in the region of the drainage channel (7) and has, at the end remote from the abutment (3), a connection profile (6) which interlocks with the window or door frame or the facade construction (5). The profile is glass fibre-reinforced polyamide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/58; E06B 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/30 (2006.01); E06B 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/14 (2013.01); E06B 3/308 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19601505 C1 19970619; AT 227802 T 20021115; EP 0785335 A1 19970723; EP 0785335 B1 20021113; PL 181271 B1 20010731; PL 317928 A1 19970721

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-01-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050114

2004-10-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040114

2004-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NORSK HYDRO ASA

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040122

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-01-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040114

2004-01-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040114

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-03-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030313

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030130

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030113

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030110

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030108

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-07 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030107

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708684 20021219

2002-12-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227802 T 20021115

2000-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000711

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971129

1997-11-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

1997-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT NL SE