Global Patent Index - EP 0785338 B1

EP 0785338 B1 2000-03-15 - Turbine disc cooling device

Title (en)

Turbine disc cooling device

Title (de)

Kühleinrichtung für eine Turbinenscheibe

Title (fr)

Dispositif de refroidissement d'un disque de turbine

Publication

EP 0785338 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400078 A

Priority

FR 9600521 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0785338A1] The cooler is for a turbine disc (2) covered by a flange (13). The cooler comprises first and second ventilation circuits (I,II) for air. Both circuits issue from a stator and discharge respectively before an inner crown of the disc and an outer crown (22) of the flange. The first circuit branches towards a seal situated between the flange and the stator, and is parallel to the flange towards the outer crown. The cooler has a component (30) situated in front of the outer crown and having first and second channels (31,32) passing through it. The first channels (31) lie parallel to one surface of the flange, extending the first ventilation circuit. The second channels (32) extend the second circuit, crossing the first channels without intersecting them and ending before the outer crown.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/081 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0785338 A1 19970723; EP 0785338 B1 20000315; CA 2195040 A1 19970719; CA 2195040 C 20051115; DE 69701405 D1 20000420; DE 69701405 T2 20000803; FR 2743844 A1 19970725; FR 2743844 B1 19980220; US 5800125 A 19980901

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160116

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160116

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69701405

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160111

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-06-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120517 AND 20120523

2006-02-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-01-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-01-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000410

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701405 20000420

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981208

1997-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970203

1997-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB