Global Patent Index - EP 0785344 B1

EP 0785344 B1 2002-09-04 - Push-in oil cooling nozzle

Title (en)

Push-in oil cooling nozzle

Title (de)

Aufsteckbare Kühlungsöldüse

Title (fr)

Gicleur de refroidissement à emmanchement

Publication

EP 0785344 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97420004 A

Priority

FR 9600698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0785344A1] The cooling jet consists of a body (7) with an axial channel (8) and a transverse aperture (9) to which its outlet duct (10) is connected. The body is designed to be fixed into the engine cylinder wall so that its axial channel links with a coolant fluid feed port (15). The body of the jet comprises a cylindrical bush (14) which lies coaxially with the axial channel (8) and has an outer diameter designed to give a force fit in the fluid feed port (15). Its outer surface can be milled or smooth. The injection duct (10) has two opposite lateral faces which are able to co-operate with positioning stops during manufacture and assembly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 3/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0785344 A1 19970723; EP 0785344 B1 20020904; AT 223557 T 20020915; DE 69715055 D1 20021010; DE 69715055 T2 20030430; DE 785344 T1 19980129; ES 2183109 T3 20030316; FR 2743847 A1 19970725; FR 2743847 B1 19980227; HK 1001410 A1 20030110; PT 785344 E 20030131

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170109

2017-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170117

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170107

2017-04-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170426

2017-02-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 223557 T

- Effective date: 20170108

2017-02-01 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170107

2017-01-08 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69715055

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160105

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151229

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151224

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: BONTAZ CENTRE R & D, FR

- Document: AT 223557 T

- Effective date: 20150903

2014-12-12 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BONTAZ CENTRE R & D

- Effective date: 20141205

2014-12-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BONTAZ CENTRE R&D, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BONTAZ CENTRE, MARNAZ, FR

- Document: DE 69715055

- Effective date: 20141029

2014-12-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69715055

- Representative's name: BUELOW, TAM VON, DIPL.-ING.DIPL.-WIRTSCH.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20141029

2014-11-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20141023 AND 20141029

2014-11-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: BONTAZ CENTRE R & D, FR

- Effective date: 20141016

2014-10-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69715055

- Representative's name: BUELOW, TAM VON, DIPL.-ING.DIPL.-WIRTSCH.-ING., DE

2014-10-23 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: BONTAZ CENTRE R & D, FR

- Effective date: 20141016

2011-12-30 [REG FR RG] LIEN (PLEDGE) CANCELLED

- Effective date: 20111129

2008-03-14 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

2008-03-14 [REG FR RG] LIEN (PLEDGE) CANCELLED

2006-05-12 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

2005-09-23 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183109 T3

2003-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021126

2003-01-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021220

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715055 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT PT

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223557 T 20020915

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001201

1998-01-29 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971201

1997-09-24 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1997-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT PT