Global Patent Index - EP 0785402 B1

EP 0785402 B1 2001-05-02 - Heat treatment installation for metallic article loads

Title (en)

Heat treatment installation for metallic article loads

Title (de)

Wärmebehandlungsanlage für eine Ladung aus metallischen Stücken

Title (fr)

Installation pour le traitement thermique d'une charge de pièces métalliques

Publication

EP 0785402 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96810035 A

Priority

EP 96810035 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0785402A1] An installation for the heat treatment of a charge of metal components comprises: (a) a first assembly (1) of elements (2 - 7, 9) arranged in an upper line, at least two of these elements being furnaces open at the bottom; (b) some elements (3 - 7, 9) able to move on lateral tracks (27A - 27F) with respect to the longitudinal axis of the upper line, allowing the sliding of these elements of the first assembly from a working position to a transfer position and back, the working position for each moving furnace (3 - 7) incorporating a hoist (30) acting on a stopper on the furnace; (c) a second assembly (11) of elements (12 - 14) of which at least one is a quenching vat, these elements fitted with hoists (34) being able to move on an horizontal track (15) and arranged in a lower position under the transfer position of the first assembly, and allowing, for any number of the elements of the two assemblies, the bringing together of each element of the second assembly (11) with respect to each chosen element of the first assembly (1); and (d) a manipulator (17) for charging and discharging, moving on a vertical track (16) extending the length of the first assembly (1) and allowing the charging and discharging of all the elements of the first assembly (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27D 3/00; C21D 1/74; C21D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/00 (2006.01); F27B 17/00 (2006.01); F27D 3/00 (2006.01); C21D 1/63 (2006.01); C21D 1/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27B 17/0016 (2013.01); C21D 9/0062 (2013.01); F27D 3/0024 (2013.01); C21D 1/63 (2013.01); C21D 1/74 (2013.01); C21D 9/0018 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0785402 A1 19970723; EP 0785402 B1 20010502; AT 200927 T 20010515; DE 69612655 D1 20010607; DE 69612655 T2 20010809

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150117

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150117

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-10-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150930

2015-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 200927 T

- Effective date: 20150117

2015-08-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69612655

2014-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140113

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140131

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612655 20010607

2001-05-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200927 T 20010515

1999-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990827

1998-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971222

1997-11-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

1997-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

1997-07-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT;LV;SI