Global Patent Index - EP 0785478 A3

EP 0785478 A3 2001-01-03 - Method for forming toner images with two distinct toners

Title (en)

Method for forming toner images with two distinct toners

Title (de)

Verfahren um Tonerbilder aus zwei unterschiedlichen Tonermaterialen zu erstellen

Title (fr)

Procédé de formation d'images de toner utilisant deux matériaux de toner distincts

Publication

EP 0785478 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97200016 A

Priority

  • US 58373296 A
  • US 58373196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0785478A2] An image forming method which forms a two color toner image or an image made up of two types of toners of the same color includes forming a first image with discharged area development (DAD) and a second image with charged area development (CAD). Resolution and sharpness of the first toner image is improved if the second toner image is formed by imagewise exposing a photoconductive member through a transparent base. Scavenging of the first toner image by the development of the second toner image and other aspects of the method are improved by use of a rotating magnetic core to drive a developer containing hard magnetic carrier in a soft brush through contact with the electrostatic image. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 13/09; G03G 13/01; G03G 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/01 (2006.01); G03G 13/01 (2006.01); G03G 13/09 (2006.01); G03G 13/22 (2006.01); G03G 15/09 (2006.01); G03G 21/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 13/22 (2013.01); G03G 13/013 (2013.01); G03G 13/09 (2013.01); G03G 2215/0497 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0785478 A2 19970723; EP 0785478 A3 20010103; EP 0785478 B1 20021211; DE 69717688 D1 20030123; DE 69717688 T2 20030918; JP H09230667 A 19970905

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2005-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-10-31 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2003-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030311

2003-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-03-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030311

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69717688

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-23

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-12-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-12-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEXPRESS SOLUTIONS LLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011116

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001125

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-11-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEXPRESS SOLUTIONS LLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 03G 13/09 A, 7G 03G 13/01 B, 7G 03G 13/22 B

1997-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL