Global patent index - EP 0785807 A4

EP 0785807 A4 2000-01-12 - STENT DELIVERY SYSTEM

Title (en)

STENT DELIVERY SYSTEM

Title (de)

STENTANBRINGUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'INSERTION D'UN EXTENSEUR

Publication

EP 0785807 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96919432 A

Priority

  • US 9610345 W
  • US 49113695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2197461A1] This invention relates to a balloon dilation catheter (1), and its use in delivering a balloon expandable stent. More particularly, the catheter comprises a first, inflation lumen (2) extending therethrough and having distal and proximal ends, the distal end of the first lumen opening into and being in fluid communication with the interior of an inflatable dilation balloon (4) having distal and proximal ends, and a second lumen (3) extending coextensively with and exterior to the dilation balloon.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/958 (2013.01); A61M 29/00 (2006.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

CA 2197461 A1 19970103; CA 2197461 C 20050726; EP 0785807 A1 19970730; EP 0785807 A4 20000112

INPADOC legal status

2002-01-23 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20011128

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010816

2000-01-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 19991129

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970612

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL