Global Patent Index - EP 0785827 B1

EP 0785827 B1 2000-10-25 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING A LETTER-SORTING SYSTEM

Title (en)

METHOD OF CONTROLLING A LETTER-SORTING SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER BRIEFVERTEILANLAGE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UNE INSTALLATION DE TRIAGE DE COURRIER

Publication

EP 0785827 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96928414 A

Priority

  • DE 19528828 A
  • EP 9603457 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19528828C1] The invention concerns a method of controlling a letter-sorting system with a controllable feed device, a conveyor on which the letters are individually transported and an overlap facility with a first and a second transport path. The invention calls for a letter to be fed in when measurement of the gap L between it and the previous letter shows that L > Smin and L < S1 or L > Sstack (Smin, S1 and Sstack being predefined gap values) and, when L has a different value, for no letters to be fed in until L > Sstack.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/66 (2006.01); B07C 1/04 (2006.01); B65H 29/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/58 (2013.01); B07C 1/04 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4452 (2013.01); B65H 2511/22 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1916 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19528828 C1 19960829; EP 0785827 A1 19970730; EP 0785827 B1 20001025; JP H11502769 A 19990309; WO 9705967 A1 19970220

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2005-08-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050805

2005-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-08-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040817

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-10-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031020

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-01-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606043 20001130

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

2000-10-25 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001025

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990809

1997-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970401

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL