Global Patent Index - EP 0786045 B1

EP 0786045 B1 2000-03-08 - TWO-STROKE ENGINE COMPRISING AN ENHANCED INJECTION DEVICE AND ASSOCIATED INJECTION METHOD

Title (en)

TWO-STROKE ENGINE COMPRISING AN ENHANCED INJECTION DEVICE AND ASSOCIATED INJECTION METHOD

Title (de)

ZWEITAKTMOTOR MIT VERBESSERTER EINSPRITZANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN EINSPRITZUNG

Title (fr)

MOTEUR DEUX TEMPS A DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION AMELIORE ET PROCEDE D'INJECTION ASSOCIE

Publication

EP 0786045 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95924382 A

Priority

  • FR 9500866 W
  • FR 9410782 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5809949A] PCT No. PCT/FR95/00866 Sec. 371 Date Mar. 10, 1997 Sec. 102(e) Date Mar. 10, 1997 PCT Filed Jun. 28, 1995 PCT Pub. No. WO96/07817 PCT Pub. Date Mar. 14, 1996The present invention relates to a two-stroke engine comprising at least: a cylinder (111) in which a piston (112) moves and one end of which communicates with a pump crankcase (115) crossed through by the crankshaft (114) of the engine, a capacity under pressure (87) opening at one end into the combustion chamber (113) of the cylinder (111), at least one valve (86) ensuring an intermittent sealing between the chamber (113) and the capacity (87), a means (88) intended for carburetting the gas passing in said capacity (87), a means for controlling the opening of said valve (86) comprising a supple membrane (89) separating two chambers (95a, 95b) and connected to the rod of the valve. The engine according to the invention further comprises a liking means (92) between one (95b) of said chambers and the pump crankcase (115) of said cylinder, allowing notably the opening of the valve (86) to be activated as soon as possible when the pressure PB in the chamber (95b) becomes lower than the pressure PS in said capacity (87).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/02; F02B 33/04; F02M 69/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/02 (2006.01); F02B 33/04 (2006.01); F02M 67/02 (2006.01); F02M 69/08 (2006.01); F02M 69/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 69/08 (2013.01); F01L 9/026 (2013.01); F02B 33/04 (2013.01); F02M 67/02 (2013.01); F02M 69/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

US 5809949 A 19980922; AT 190381 T 20000315; AU 1511397 A 19980129; AU 704865 B2 19990506; CN 1073199 C 20011017; CN 1157646 A 19970820; DE 69515499 D1 20000413; DE 69515499 T2 20001123; EP 0786045 A1 19970730; EP 0786045 B1 20000308; FR 2724415 A1 19960315; FR 2724415 B1 19961220; JP H10505147 A 19980519; TW 347437 B 19981211; WO 9607817 A1 19960314

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050628

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU *PETROLE

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-02-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030628

2003-07-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030704

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-06-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030628

2003-06-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030623

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030101

2003-02-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-05-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020527

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-06-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010615

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-05-03 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010503

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515499 20000413

2000-03-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB IT LI NL

2000-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190381 T 20000315

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990428

1997-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970409

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB IT LI NL