Global Patent Index - EP 0786047 B1

EP 0786047 B1 2000-06-07 - DEVICE WITH FUEL INJECTION AND WITH A LUBRICANT-SUPPLY UNIT FOR INTERNAL-COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

DEVICE WITH FUEL INJECTION AND WITH A LUBRICANT-SUPPLY UNIT FOR INTERNAL-COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG MIT KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZUNG UND SCHMIERMITTELFÖRDEREINRICHTUNG FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMOTOREN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT ET D'ALIMENTATION EN LUBRIFIANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0786047 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96927669 A

Priority

  • DE 19529368 A
  • EP 9603424 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5787854A] PCT No. PCT/EP96/03424 Sec. 371 Date Apr. 10, 1997 Sec. 102(e) Date Apr. 10, 1997 PCT Filed Aug. 2, 1996 PCT Pub. No. WO97/06359 PCT Pub. Date Feb. 20, 1997In order to provide a device with fuel injection and lubricant feed means for internal combustion engines, preferably for manual guided equipment, such as chain saws, with a helical gear wheel (12) mounted on a crankshaft (11) or driven indirectly by the crankshaft (11), which is in engagement with a mating gear wheel (13) for driving the lubricant pump (16), wherein a piston (17) of the lubricant pump (16) forms a trunnion for the mating gear wheel (13) and possesses an oblique anterior surface (18) which bears against a lifting stud (20) adjustably retained in the housing, for aiding lubricant delivery adjustment of the lubricant pump (16), in a compact assembly, preferably a chain saw with several, lubrication circuits and a high-pressure fuel feed it is proposed that the helical gear wheel (12) be in engagement with two mating gear wheels (13,14), each connected with a drive shaft (17,26) for one lubricant pump (16,31) and/or one fuel pump (27).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 63/02; F02B 67/04; F16N 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27B 17/12 (2006.01); F01M 1/02 (2006.01); F01M 3/00 (2006.01); F02B 63/02 (2006.01); F02B 67/04 (2006.01); F02M 37/06 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 63/02 (2013.01); B27B 17/12 (2013.01); F01M 1/02 (2013.01); F01M 3/00 (2013.01); F02B 67/04 (2013.01); F02M 37/06 (2013.01); F02B 2075/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5787854 A 19980804; AU 6741596 A 19970305; DE 19529368 C1 19961031; EP 0786047 A1 19970730; EP 0786047 B1 20000607; WO 9706359 A1 19970220

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2002-06-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2001-08-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010803

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001020

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20000825

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000817

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605397 20000713

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2000-05-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ST. TECN. INGG. SIMONI - DE BLASIO

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990922

1997-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970409

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE