Global Patent Index - EP 0786049 B1

EP 0786049 B1 2001-04-04 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 0786049 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96928321 A

Priority

  • DE 9601358 W
  • DE 19529375 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19529375A1] In known fuel injection valves, gas is supplied in an adapter through gas supply channels oriented towards the fuel in a central opening. These adapters are made of a single piece, so that no variable gas dosage is possible and machining the gas supply channels is made more difficult. The new adapter body (50) for a fuel injection valve (1), however, is made of several pieces, namely a base body (51) and at least one calibrating sleeve (52). Gas is supplied and dosed through the calibrating sleeve (52), whereas the base body (51) serves only for sealing and fixing purposes. Size-accurate calibrating sleeves (52) may be easily and economically machined. This design allows a great diversity of embodiments to be obtained in a simple manner. This fuel injection valve is particularly useful for fuel injection systems of spark-ignited, high compression ratio internal combustion engines.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 69/04; F02M 51/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/08 (2006.01); F02M 43/04 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01); F02M 69/04 (2006.01); F02M 51/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 69/047 (2013.01); F02M 43/04 (2013.01); F02M 61/1853 (2013.01); F02M 51/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19529375 A1 19970213; CN 1066243 C 20010523; CN 1158153 A 19970827; EP 0786049 A1 19970730; EP 0786049 B1 20010404; JP H10507509 A 19980721; US 5904299 A 19990518; WO 9706365 A1 19970220

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050724

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030724

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-07-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030724

2002-08-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020826

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020723

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020711

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010614

2001-06-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-05-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606717 20010510

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000525

1997-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970820

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT