Global Patent Index - EP 0786068 B1

EP 0786068 B1 2000-04-26 - SMALL OR MEDIUM GAUGE MULTITUBE AUTOMATIC FIRE ARM OF THE GATLING TYPE, PARTICULARLY INTENDED TO THE FIRING OF TELESCOPED AMMUNITION

Title (en)

SMALL OR MEDIUM GAUGE MULTITUBE AUTOMATIC FIRE ARM OF THE GATLING TYPE, PARTICULARLY INTENDED TO THE FIRING OF TELESCOPED AMMUNITION

Title (de)

MEHRLÄUFIGE AUTOMATISCHE FEUERWAFFE VOM GALINGTYPE, INSBESONDERE ZUM VERSCHIESSEN VON TELESKOPARTIGEN MUNITIONEN

Title (fr)

ARME A FEU AUTOMATIQUE MULTITUBES DE PETIT OU MOYEN CALIBRE DU TYPE GATLING, NOTAMMENT DESTINEE AU TIR DE MUNITIONS TELESCOPEES

Publication

EP 0786068 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95920968 A

Priority

FR 9500665 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5817967A] PCT No. PCT/FR95/00665 Sec. 371 Date May 1, 1997 Sec. 102(e) Date May 1, 1997 PCT Filed May 19, 1995 PCT Pub. No. WO96/36845 PCT Pub. Date Nov. 21, 1996A small or medium-caliber multi-barrel automatic weapon of the GATLING type, notably designed to fire telescoped munitions, having a loading and firing system (SC) having several pivoting chambers (20). Each chamber is mounted pivoting around a stay (30), is associated with a barrel of the weapon and moves from a loading area (ZC) to a firing area (ZT), said chamber (20) being guided during its movement by guiding means formed of a fixed inner cam (32) and a fixed outer cam (34) which are separated from one another by an even distance corresponding to the outer diameter of the chambers (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 9/36; F41F 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 9/36 (2006.01); F41A 9/45 (2006.01); F41F 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41F 1/10 (2013.01); F41A 9/36 (2013.01); F41A 9/45 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 5817967 A 19981006; EP 0786068 A1 19970730; EP 0786068 B1 20000426; FR 2718837 A1 19951020; FR 2718837 B1 19960614; WO 9636845 A1 19961121

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060519

2006-05-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060519

2005-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050530

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB

1999-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990304

1997-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970116

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR GB