Global Patent Index - EP 0786128 B1

EP 0786128 B1 2000-03-29 - A DISPLAY BOARD

Title (en)

A DISPLAY BOARD

Title (de)

ANZEIGETAFEL

Title (fr)

PANNEAU D'EXPOSITION

Publication

EP 0786128 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95933508 A

Priority

  • GB 9502381 W
  • GB 9420464 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2294147A] A display board, especially for paint sample cards, and which comprises a support unit, and at least one cartridge (16) for detachably mounting on the support unit, each cartridge (16) having a frame (17) into which a paint sample card (18) can be loaded. The frame (17) is curved in at least one direction to present a curved paint surface which can mimic a curved car body panel. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 5/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2294147 A 19960417; GB 2294147 B 19981209; GB 9420464 D0 19941123; DE 69516009 D1 20000504; DE 69516009 T2 20000914; EP 0786128 A1 19970730; EP 0786128 B1 20000329; ES 2144634 T3 20000616; WO 9611460 A1 19960418

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081010

2009-12-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20081010

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081009

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090630

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071011

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071023

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071120

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-10-04 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061004

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-09-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060925

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-09-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060911

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2144634

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69516009

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-04

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

2000-03-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000329

1998-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971208

1997-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970510

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE