Global Patent Index - EP 0786231 B1

EP 0786231 B1 2000-03-29 - Hydraulic connection device for a dishwasher rack which can be positioned at two different heights

Title (en)

Hydraulic connection device for a dishwasher rack which can be positioned at two different heights

Title (de)

Hydraulische Verbindungsvorrichtung für einen auf zwei unterschiedlichen Höhen positionierbaren Geschirrkorb

Title (fr)

Dispositif de connection hydraulique pour panier de lave vaisselle qui peut être positionné à deux différentes hauteurs

Publication

EP 0786231 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97830020 A

Priority

IT MI960150 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0786231A2] A hydraulic connection device for a dishwasher rack which can be positioned at two different heights includes a sprinkler feed duct (1), integral with the rack and extending upto the outlet (7) of the supply pipe, said duct (1) being provided with an enlarged end chamber (2, 2', 2") divided into an upper inlet (3) and a lower inlet (3') suitable to be alternately fit onto said outlet (7), as well as with shutter means moving inside said chamber (2, 2', 2") under the action of the water flow coming from the outlet (7) so as to open that inlet (3, 3') which is in use and close the one which is not in use. The shutter means may consist of a vane (4) rotatable around a horizontal pivot (5) located between the two inlets (3, 3'), or a ball (11) slidable along a guide rim (12), or a pair vanes (4', 4") arranged one on each inlet (3, 3'). The result is a simple, cheap and reliable device with no problems of tightness or high flow resistance. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/23 (2006.01); A47L 15/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/508 (2013.01); A47L 15/23 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0786231 A2 19970730; EP 0786231 A3 19971008; EP 0786231 B1 20000329; DE 69701535 D1 20000504; DE 69701535 T2 20000824; ES 2144837 T3 20000616; IT 1282096 B1 19980312; IT MI960150 A1 19970729; IT MI960150 D0 19960129

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070128

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080129

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2009-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080129

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080129

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080128

2008-12-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080128

2008-09-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070111

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-01-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-01-11 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070111

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-01-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070110

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144837 T3

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701535 20000504

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-10-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990525

1998-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980327

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE