Global Patent Index - EP 0786287 B1

EP 0786287 B1 2000-08-16 - Fluid mixing device, particularly for paint or industrial ink

Title (en)

Fluid mixing device, particularly for paint or industrial ink

Title (de)

Mischvorrichtung für Fluide, insbesondere für industrielle Tinten oder Farben

Title (fr)

Dispositif mélangeur pour fluides, en particulier pour encres industrielles ou peintures

Publication

EP 0786287 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97101049 A

Priority

IT TO960049 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0786287A1] A fluid mixing device, particularly for paint or industrial ink, having a supporting structure (3) supporting a number of straight guides (22), which extend radially from a central portion (5) of the supporting structure (3) and in turn support respective slides (24), each fitted with a normally-closed three-way valve (29). The mixing device also has a selecting device (42) fitted to the supporting structure (3) and having a rotary tubular portion (57), which is movable angularly about an axis of rotation (11) and supports a linear actuator crosswise to the tubular portion and having an engaging member (108, 109) movable linearly between a withdrawn position and an extracted position in which the engaging member engages a slide to draw the slide into a central operating position in which the valve is opened. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 13/1058 (2013.01); B01F 13/1055 (2013.01); B01F 2215/005 (2013.01); B01F 2215/0059 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0786287 A1 19970730; EP 0786287 B1 20000816; DE 69702778 D1 20000921; DE 69702778 T2 20001214; ES 2150709 T3 20001201; IT 1284347 B1 19980518; IT TO960049 A1 19970728; IT TO960049 D0 19960126

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170124

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170122

2017-04-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170428

2017-02-15 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170122

2017-01-25 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20170122

2017-01-23 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69702778

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160111

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151214

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151208

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150709 T3

2000-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702778 20000921

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL

1999-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991028

1998-03-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980127

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL