Global Patent Index - EP 0786312 B1

EP 0786312 B1 2000-06-14 - Process treatment for a metallic surface and the manufacturing of a cooking utensil

Title (en)

Process treatment for a metallic surface and the manufacturing of a cooking utensil

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Behandlung einer metallischen Oberfläche und Herstellung eines Kochgeschirrs

Title (fr)

Procédé de traitement d'une surface métallique et de fabrication d'un article culinaire

Publication

EP 0786312 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400100 A

Priority

FR 9600799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0786312A1] Treating a metal surface, e.g. for cooking utensils, comprises: (i) forming a series of micro-cavities in the treated surface; (ii) partially applying a coating on the surface, e.g. PTFE; and (iii) smoothing the non coated surface by projecting small balls (7) on the surface. Also claimed is the manufacture of cooking utensils by treating a metal layer (1), providing a continuous coating (2) of PTFE on a first surface (1b) and a partial coating (3) which is decorative on the other surface (1a).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24C 1/10; B08B 7/02; B24B 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 7/02 (2006.01); B24B 1/04 (2006.01); B24C 1/10 (2006.01); B24C 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24C 5/005 (2013.01); B08B 7/028 (2013.01); B24B 1/04 (2013.01); B24C 1/10 (2013.01); B24C 5/08 (2013.01); Y10T 29/479 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49982 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0786312 A1 19970730; EP 0786312 B1 20000614; DE 69702271 D1 20000720; DE 69702271 T2 20010222; FR 2743742 A1 19970725; FR 2743742 B1 19980403; US 5829116 A 19981103

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160117

2016-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-10-05 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69702271

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160131

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150109

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150115

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69702271

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-20

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT NL

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990614

1997-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971020

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT NL