Global Patent Index - EP 0786327 B1

EP 0786327 B1 2000-11-15 - Doubling and winding device for producing carcasses of transport or driving belts

Title (en)

Doubling and winding device for producing carcasses of transport or driving belts

Title (de)

Dublier- und Wickeleinrichtung zur Herstellung von Karkassen von Transport- oder Antriebsbändern

Title (fr)

Dispositif de doublage et d'enroulement pour la fabrication de carcasses de courroies de transport ou d'entraînement

Publication

EP 0786327 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96117820 A

Priority

DE 19602534 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CZ290743B6] The proposed device comprises drums (17, 18) and a doubling conveyor (9), being arranged between said drums (17, 18), further a feeding device (1) of webs (2) intended for doubling, optionally winding. Delivery feeders (4, 5), located beyond said feeding device (1) and in front of the doubling conveyor (9), are inclined downwards in opposite directions. By their lower ends, the delivery feeders (4, 5) can swivel in the direct proximity of the doubling conveyor (9). They are variably positioned on one run-out of the feed unit so that webs (2, 22, 23) can be placed automatically on the doubling conveyor (9), or on the webs (2, 22, 23) laying on the doubling conveyor 9). On the delivery feeders (4, 5) there are arranged means formed by dynamometric rollers (6, 7, 8, 12, 13, 20) for detecting tension of webs (2, 22, 23) and for adjustment of said doubling conveyor (9) velocity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29D 29/00; B65H 19/22; B65H 19/28; B65H 39/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/08 (2006.01); B65H 19/22 (2006.01); B65H 19/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/2207 (2013.01); B65H 19/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29619344 U1 19970109; CZ 290743 B6 20021016; CZ 9603339 A3 19971015; EP 0786327 A2 19970730; EP 0786327 A3 19980107; EP 0786327 B1 20001115

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091107

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081113

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081125

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-04-02 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20020924

2002-04-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BERSTORFF GMBH

2001-10-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CONTINENTAL AG

- Effective date: 20010813

2000-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606142 20001221

2000-11-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000331

1998-07-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980520

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT