Global patent index - EP 0786350 B1

EP 0786350 B1 2000-04-19 - Capping device for a franking machine

Title (en)

Capping device for a franking machine

Title (de)

Verschlussvorrichtung für eine Frankiermaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'encapuchonnage de base de machine à affranchir

Publication

EP 0786350 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400146 A

Priority

FR 9600924 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0786350A1] The device for capping the ink jet nozzles integrated within an ink jet printing head comprises a protection element (8) mounted on a support (20). The element may be moved between a first position in which it rests on the base of the machine, and a second position in which it covers perfectly the row of ink jet nozzles. The movement of the cover operates by means of a lever system (21). The cover is automatically moved from the first position to the second position when the electrical supply to the machine is switched off by means of a motor (44) which stores energy. The recharge of this motor with energy for a future operation is ensured by the displacement of the cover back to its first position, under the action of a second motor drive (54).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/165; G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/165 (2006.01); G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/16585 (2013.01); G07B 17/00508 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00532 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00556 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0786350 A1 19970730; EP 0786350 B1 20000419; DE 69701708 D1 20000525; DE 69701708 T2 20001026; FR 2744059 A1 19970801; FR 2744059 B1 19980430

INPADOC legal status

2001-11-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2001-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011101

2001-09-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-09-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010123

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010123

2000-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69701708

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-25

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981019

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971031

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB