Global Patent Index - EP 0786390 B1

EP 0786390 B1 2000-06-28 - Car body for high speed railways

Title (en)

Car body for high speed railways

Title (de)

Wagenkasten für Schnellbahnen

Title (fr)

Caisse pour rames à grandes vitesses

Publication

EP 0786390 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810048 A

Priority

EP 96810048 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0786390A1] A carriage for rapid trains, especially magnetic levitation trains, comprises a cell (12) with a longitudinal carrier profile (35), made of aluminium and a light weight laminar plate material. The laminar plates (37) comprises a plastic core (32) with aluminium cover plates (34) on each side. The cover plates have an associated connection profile (36) made of aluminium. The connection profile has strips (38,40) which locate on the carrier profile, and the connection profile (36) is welded by laser to the carrier profile.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 17/00; B61D 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 17/00 (2006.01); B61D 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 17/005 (2013.01); B61D 17/043 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0786390 A1 19970730; EP 0786390 B1 20000628; AU 694930 B2 19980806; AU 7645696 A 19970731; DE 59605497 D1 20000803; US 5784970 A 19980728

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-01-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605497

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605497 20000803

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990310

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980130

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI