Global patent index - EP 0786408 B1

EP 0786408 B1 2000-01-19 - Method of making container carriers and packaging containers in container carriers and apparatus for carrying out the method

Title (en)

Method of making container carriers and packaging containers in container carriers and apparatus for carrying out the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen von Behälterträgern und Abpacken von Behältern in Behälterträgern und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de porte-récipients et d'emballage de récipients dans des porte-récipients et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé

Publication

EP 0786408 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97101153 A

Priority

DE 19602358 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19602358C1] The method uses a packaging machine with one magazine feed of flat form inner spacers (3) and one magazine feed of flat form packs (2). The bottles are fed to the packing in two continuous lines (9,12) with a revolving feed (11) taking the spacers and raising their tags (7) before inserting between the two lines of bottles. The flat form packs are fed to the conveyor from underneath and a successive folding process assembles the packs around the groups of bottles. The bottles are separated into the groups, after inserting the spacers, by a faster conveyor feed. The packs are then folded by passing through successive stages, with the sides of the packs, and the spacers, glued into position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 21/24; B65B 61/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 21/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 5/024 (2013.01); B65B 21/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19602358 C1 19970313; EP 0786408 A1 19970730; EP 0786408 B1 20000119

INPADOC legal status

2002-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-09-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020124

2002-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-01-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010314

- Year of fee payment: 05

2001-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010131

- Year of fee payment: 05

2001-01-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010124

- Year of fee payment: 05

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59701016

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000224

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB NL

1998-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980323

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980116

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB NL