Global Patent Index - EP 0786412 B1

EP 0786412 B1 2001-12-12 - Transport and storage container

Title (en)

Transport and storage container

Title (de)

Transport- und Lagerbehälter

Title (fr)

Récipient de stockage ou de transport

Publication

EP 0786412 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97101169 A

Priority

  • DE 19602651 A
  • DE 19613086 A
  • DE 19623690 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0786412A1] The container has a rectangular base (30) and four side walls (10, 20). When the container is empty, the top of each wall is folded inwards about a pivot axis parallel to the base edges. Two opposite first walls have curved corner sections (11). These, and the second side walls, have overlapping connection sections (12, 22) of a thickness, which is reduced by approx. 50%. The base has plinth parts (31), with rounded corner sections. Two opposite second side walls (20) have sideward projecting shoulders (21), which are positioned between the base and the round wall corners, when the walls are upright.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 6/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 6/18 (2006.01); B65D 6/16 (2006.01); B65D 6/22 (2006.01); B65D 6/24 (2006.01); B65D 6/26 (2006.01); B65D 88/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 11/1833 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0786412 A1 19970730; EP 0786412 B1 20011212; AT 210580 T 20011215; AU 1719697 A 19970820; AU 734508 B2 20010614; CA 2216121 A1 19970731; CA 2216121 C 20021112; CN 1071241 C 20010919; CN 1182398 A 19980520; DK 0786412 T3 20020408; ES 2169280 T3 20020701; JP 3963279 B2 20070822; JP H11502492 A 19990302; PT 786412 E 20020628; RU 2180647 C2 20020320; TR 199701038 T1 19971221; US 5967356 A 19991019; WO 9727115 A1 19970731

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170126

2018-05-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180508

2017-03-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 210580 T

- Effective date: 20170125

2017-01-25 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20170124

2017-01-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59705717

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160108

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160113

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160112

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160113

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160111

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120125

2013-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120725

2012-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120802

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120125

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120126

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120125

2012-09-24 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20020400193

- Effective date: 20120802

2012-09-10 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2012-09-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-08-01 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20120725

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110119

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20110113

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20110215

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110111

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20110107

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110112

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110111

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169280 T3

2002-06-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020311

2002-05-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020400193

2002-04-08 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2002-03-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020225

2002-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: INTERPAT LAW AG

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705717 20020124

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19970219

2001-12-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19970219

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210580 T 20011215

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000516

1999-10-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BEKUPLAST KUNSTSTOFFVERARBEITUNGS-GMBH

1999-10-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WAVIN TREPAK HOLDING BV

1999-09-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WAVIN TREPAK HOLDING BV

1999-09-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BEROLINA KUNSTSTOFF-GESELLSCHAFT MBH & CO. VERPAC

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980113

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1997-07-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;SI PAYMENT 970219