Global Patent Index - EP 0786416 B1

EP 0786416 B1 2000-03-29 - Two-piece plastic clip

Title (en)

Two-piece plastic clip

Title (de)

Kunststoff-Clip aus zwei Teilen

Title (fr)

Clip plastique en deux parties

Publication

EP 0786416 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97200629 A

Priority

  • DE 4327064 A
  • DE 4401111 A
  • EP 94924784 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9505320A1] A plastic clip in two parts is used for closing sausage casings, bags or the like. The first part (1) holds the end of the casing gathered together into a plait in a U-shaped cavity formed by side faces and cross-bars. The second part (2) bridges the cavity (4) of the first part and is lockingly secured to the first part. The second part (2) is linked at one of its transverse ends to the first part (1) by means of a film hinge (3) and has a locking arm (16) at its other transverse end that may engage a locking projection (22) on the other cross-bar (6) of the first part for closing the clip. A traverse (8) spaced apart from the cross-bar (6) next to the hinge interconnects the side faces (5) and is gripped in the closed state by an arm on the second part, so that a high closing pressure is exercised at the same time as the required elasticity is maintained. A device for closing such a plastic clip has two cavities (37, 39) for receiving both clip parts (33, 34). One cavity (37) is fixed and the other (39) may swivel around an axis (40) aligned with the hinge axis (35) of the clip parts (33, 34). The second reception cavity (39) is swivelled into the closed position of the clip by a mechanical drive (38, 41, 42). In an improvement of the closing device, a positioning arrangement (50) feeds the clip to be closed from a supply channel (32) to the reception cavities (37, 39) of the closing mechanism by means of a cam-controlled driver (56).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 33/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 51/04 (2006.01); B65D 33/16 (2006.01); B65D 33/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/1675 (2013.01); B65B 51/04 (2013.01); Y10T 24/15 (2013.01); Y10T 24/44752 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9505320 A1 19950223; AU 7494794 A 19950314; DK 0786416 T3 20000710; EP 0712365 A1 19960522; EP 0712365 B1 19971022; EP 0786416 A1 19970730; EP 0786416 B1 20000329; ES 2108487 T3 19971216; ES 2146950 T3 20000816; JP 3187430 B2 20010711; JP H09501379 A 19970210; TW 267141 B 19960101; US 5735022 A 19980407

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050719

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030811

2003-05-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-03-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2002-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020720

2001-08-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010801

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010730

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-07-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010723

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-07-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20010723

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-07-23 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010723

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-06-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010618

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146950 T3

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-06-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409258 20000504

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-29 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 712365

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR IT LI NL

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990118

1997-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970304

1997-07-30 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 712365

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR IT LI NL