Global Patent Index - EP 0786431 B1

EP 0786431 B1 2000-04-26 - Crane

Title (en)

Crane

Title (de)

Kran

Title (fr)

Grue

Publication

EP 0786431 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97100490 A

Priority

DE 19602972 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0786431A2] The crane has a stand (2) on its own chassis, on which an extendable boom (3) can turn. The stand, without the ballast boom, is on another vehicle (4), independent of the road vehicle and of smaller dimensions. The vehicle has a ballast arrangement. On the free end there are support beams carrying a leg. The small vehicle can be mounted on and released from the road vehicle, and when removed from it, can travel and manoeuvre independently.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 23/42; B66C 23/62; B66C 23/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60P 3/28 (2006.01); B62D 7/14 (2006.01); B66C 23/62 (2006.01); B66C 23/74 (2006.01); B66C 23/78 (2006.01); B66C 23/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/80 (2013.01); B66C 23/54 (2013.01); B66C 23/62 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0786431 A2 19970730; EP 0786431 A3 19980422; EP 0786431 B1 20000426; AT 192120 T 20000515; DE 19602972 A1 19970731; DK 0786431 T3 20001009; ES 2146928 T3 20000816

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2005-12-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051205

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040116

2005-01-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050115

2004-10-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-09-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2004-08-31 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BIEDENBACH WALTER

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-02-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040202

2004-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040116

2004-01-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040116

2004-01-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040115

2004-01-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040115

2003-01-03 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030103

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-10 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20021210

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-09 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20021209

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-09 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20021209

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-09 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20021209

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021209

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-09 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20021209

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-06 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021206

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20021205

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146928 T3

2000-06-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DR. ING. AUSSERER ANTON

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701488 20000531

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR IT LI NL SE

2000-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192120 T 20000515

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990122

1998-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980730

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR IT LI NL SE

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR IT LI NL SE