Global Patent Index - EP 0786433 B1

EP 0786433 B1 2000-09-06 - Capping head

Title (en)

Capping head

Title (de)

Kapselverschliesskopf

Title (fr)

Tête à capsuler

Publication

EP 0786433 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97500017 A

Priority

ES 9600159 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0786433A1] The capping head is designed to fix a capsule (11) on the top of a bottle neck by deformation. The capping head has a series of planetary rollers (4) which rotate around the capsule on rods (2). The rods are mounted on the cylindrical head by articulated joints (3) situated at the opposite end to the rollers. The head also has an intermediate outer member for applying a pressure to the rods, made in the form of a ring with a series of balance arms (6). The balance arms have their own pivots (7), are able to apply a pressure to the individual rollers, and equipped with springs. The ring which supports them is able to move up and down the head and be locked in the required position by spring-loaded balls.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67B 5/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67B 5/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67B 5/032 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0786433 A1 19970730; EP 0786433 B1 20000906; AT 196128 T 20000915; DE 69702990 D1 20001012; DE 69702990 T2 20010301; ES 2128918 A1 19990516; ES 2128918 B1 20000116; ES 2156059 A1 20010601; ES 2156059 B1 20020201; ES 2159454 A1 20011001; ES 2159454 B1 20020501; PT 786433 E 20010131

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2012-02-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69702990

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110124

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110124

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110124

2011-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110725

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110124

2011-08-02 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20110725

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100114

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100223

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20100118

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001106

2000-12-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001204

2000-11-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702990 20001012

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT PT

2000-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196128 T 20000915

1999-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991108

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971204

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT PT