Global Patent Index - EP 0786464 B1

EP 0786464 B1 2001-05-30 - A method for manufacturing acryloxypropylsilane

Title (en)

A method for manufacturing acryloxypropylsilane

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Acryloxypropylsilane

Title (fr)

Procédé de préparation de acryloxypropylsilanes

Publication

EP 0786464 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97101137 A

Priority

JP 3144996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0786464A1] A method to manufacture acryloxypropylsilane to a high degree of purity is achieved by Hydrosilation of (A) allyl acrylate or allyl methacrylate by (B) a hydrosilane compound, using (C) a platinum-containing compound as the catalyst and (D) an organic phosphorus compound as the promoter. The acryloxypropylsilane product is expressed by General Formula I. CH2 = CR<1>COOCH2CH2CH2SiR<2>nR<3>3-n R<1> represents a hydrogen or methyl group, R<2> represents a hydrolyzable group, R<3> represents an aryl, alkenyl or aryl group of carbon number 1-12, and n is 0, 1, 2, or 3.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07F 7/14; C07F 7/08; C07F 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 31/28 (2006.01); B01J 31/24 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07F 7/08 (2006.01); C07F 7/12 (2006.01); C07F 7/14 (2006.01); C07F 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07F 7/0829 (2013.01); C07F 7/14 (2013.01); C07F 7/1876 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0786464 A1 19970730; EP 0786464 B1 20010530; DE 69704964 D1 20010705; DE 69704964 T2 20011115; JP 2978435 B2 19991115; JP H09202791 A 19970805; US 5750753 A 19980512

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69704964

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JNC CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CHISSO CORP., OSAKA, JP

- Document: DE 69704964

- Effective date: 20120117

2012-03-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69704964

- Representative's name: MUELLER-BORE & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE

- Effective date: 20120117

2012-01-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69704964

- Representative's name: MUELLER-BORE & PARTNER, PATENTANWAELTE, EUROPE, DE

2003-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-01-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030124

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020123

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011226

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704964 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000509

1997-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970825

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB