Global Patent Index - EP 0786531 B1

EP 0786531 B1 2000-07-19 - Process and installation for remelting of metals to a strand

Title (en)

Process and installation for remelting of metals to a strand

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Umschmelzen von Metallen zu einem Strang sowie Vorrichtung dafür

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la refusion de métaux sous forme de barres

Publication

EP 0786531 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96120752 A

Priority

AT 15196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0786531A1] The method concerns melting of metals (in particular, steels and alloys based on nickel and cobalt) to produce a continuous bar, by gradual melting of at least one consumable electrode (16) in an electrically conductive slag bath (18) held in a short casting die (20). The electrode melting rate in kg/hr is set to a value equal to 1.5 to 30 times the bar diameter in mm, with the ratio of the cross-sectional area of one or more electrodes to the cross-sectional area of the bar chosen greater than 0.5. The apparatus used for implementation of the method includes at least one consumable electrode (16) and a continuous casting die (20) joined to a current source (10). The die is provided with an exit section determining the bar cross-section, and a broadened upper section (22) for a slag bath (18). At least one current-carrying element (42) is built into the die wall (28).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22B 9/18; B22D 23/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B22D 11/041 (2006.01); B22D 23/10 (2006.01); C22B 9/18 (2006.01); C22B 9/187 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22B 9/18 (2013.01); B22D 23/10 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

GB 1413508 A 19751112 - BRITISH STEEL CORP

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0786531 A1 19970730; EP 0786531 B1 20000719; EP 0786531 B2 20060802; AT 406384 B 20000425; AT A15196 A 19990915; DE 19654021 A1 19970731; DE 19654021 C2 20010531; JP 3949208 B2 20070725; JP H09206890 A 19970812; US 5799721 A 19980901

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131221

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131221

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-09-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140829

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131222

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20131221

2014-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-07-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2014-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: INTERNATIONALE TECHNISCHE BERATUNG G.M.B.H. *INTEC

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130117

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-01-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: INTECO INTERNATIONALE TECHNISCHE BERATUNG GESELLS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2006-12-22 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2006-09-26 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: RPEO

2006-08-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2006-08-23 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

- Effective date: 20060802

2006-08-02 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20060802

2006-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH FR GB IT LI SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ALD VACUUM TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-11-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: HIEBSCH & PEEGE AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-09-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH FR GB IT LI SE

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981104

1998-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971119

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH FR GB IT LI SE