Global patent index - EP 0786535 B1

EP 0786535 B1 2000-04-12 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING ALUMINUM ALLOY PLATE FOR FORMING

Title (en)

METHOD OF MANUFACTURING ALUMINUM ALLOY PLATE FOR FORMING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GROBBLECHES AUS ALUMINIUM-LEGIERUNG ZUR UMFORMUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE PLAQUE D'ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM DESTINEE AU FORMAGE

Publication

EP 0786535 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95908373 A

Priority

  • JP 9500200 W
  • JP 4185094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9522634A1] An aluminum alloy ingot containing not less than 0.4 % by weight and less than 1.7 % by weight of Si, not less than 0.2 % by weight and less than 1.2 % by weight of Mg, and Al and unavoidable impurities for the remainder is homogenized at a temperature of not lower than 500 DEG C; the resultant product being cooled from a temperature of not lower than 500 DEG C to a temperature in the range of 350-450 DEG C and started to be hot rolled; the hot rolling step being finished at a temperature in the range of 200-300 DEG C; the resultant product being subjected to cold rolling at a reduction ratio of not less than 50 % immediately before it has been solution-treated; the cold rolled product being then solution-treated in which it is retained at a temperature in the range of 500-580 DEG C at a temperature increasing rate of not less than 2 DEG C/s for not more than 10 minutes; the resultant product being subjected to hardening in which it is cooled to a temperature of not higher than 100 DEG C at a cooling rate of not less than 5 DEG C/s. Thus, a method of manufacturing an aluminum alloy plate for molding is provided which has high strength and moldability and an excellent external appearance of a post-molding surface thereof, and which is suitably used as a material for transportation equipment parts, such as an outer plate for automobiles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22F 1/05; C22C 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/02 (2006.01); C22C 21/08 (2006.01); C22F 1/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/043 (2006.01); C22F 1/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/08 (2013.01); C22C 21/02 (2013.01); C22F 1/043 (2013.01); C22F 1/05 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9522634 A1 19950824; DE 69516297 D1 20000518; DE 69516297 T2 20000810; DE 69516297 T3 20030417; EP 0786535 A1 19970730; EP 0786535 A4 19970730; EP 0786535 B1 20000412; EP 0786535 B2 20021106; JP 2823797 B2 19981111; JP H07228956 A 19950829

INPADOC legal status

2015-02-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-02-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69516297

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-02-14 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69516297

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130301

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120214

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120214

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120214

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110214

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-08-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG;ELESTASTRASSE 8;7310 BAD RAGAZ (CH)

2003-06-06 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2002-11-29 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2002-11-06 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2002-03-20 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI2

- Free Format Text: METHOD OF MANUFACTURING ALUMINUM ALLOY PLATE FOR FORMING

2002-03-13 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI2

- Free Format Text: METHOD OF MANUFACTURING ALUMINUM ALLOY PLATE FOR FORMING

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ALUSUISSE TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

- Effective date: 20010111

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69516297

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-18

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-04-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-07-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD OF MANUFACTURING ALUMINUM ALLOY PLATE FOR FORMING

1999-07-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD OF MANUFACTURING ALUMINUM ALLOY PLATE FOR FORMING

1998-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980907

1997-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960916

1997-07-30 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE