Global Patent Index - EP 0786550 B1

EP 0786550 B1 2000-01-19 - Material web and production method for the same

Title (en)

Material web and production method for the same

Title (de)

Materialbahn sowie Verfahren zu deren Herstellung

Title (fr)

Bande de matériau et méthode pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 0786550 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96101069 A

Priority

EP 96101069 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0786550A1] A web of fabric (1) with a carrier (2) has an externally-even plastic layer (5, 6) at least on one side, traversed by transfer channels. According to the invention, the external side (7, 8) of the plastic layer (5, 6) also has impressions (9) between the openings of the transfer channels which are at least partly connected with one another and with the transfer channels. During the production of the fabric web, soluble particles are applied to the external side (7, 8) of the plastic layer (5, 6) during or after the production of the plastic layer (5, 6) and then pressed into the plastic layer (5, 6). These soluble particles may then be extracted by a solvent to which the fabric web (1) is resistant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/00 (2006.01); D21F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/0063 (2013.01); D21F 7/083 (2013.01); Y10T 442/3016 (2015.04); Y10T 442/3024 (2015.04); Y10T 442/3854 (2015.04); Y10T 442/3862 (2015.04); Y10T 442/3886 (2015.04); Y10T 442/3894 (2015.04); Y10T 442/3911 (2015.04); Y10T 442/40 (2015.04); Y10T 442/602 (2015.04); Y10T 442/674 (2015.04); Y10T 442/675 (2015.04); Y10T 442/678 (2015.04); Y10T 442/679 (2015.04); Y10T 442/681 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0786550 A1 19970730; EP 0786550 B1 20000119; AT 189016 T 20000215; AU 1444597 A 19970820; AU 696610 B2 19980917; BR 9704636 A 19980609; CA 2213841 A1 19970731; CA 2213841 C 20021001; CZ 293405 B6 20040414; CZ 9702996 A3 19971217; DE 59604227 D1 20000224; DK 0786550 T3 20000626; EP 0817886 A1 19980114; EP 0817886 B1 20000119; ES 2144162 T3 20000601; GR 3032802 T3 20000630; MX 9707245 A 19980830; MY 119214 A 20050430; NO 311229 B1 20011029; NO 974421 A 19970924; NO 974421 D0 19970924; PL 182272 B1 20011231; PL 322383 A1 19980119; PT 786550 E 20000531; SI 817886 T1 20000630; SK 130097 A3 19980603; SK 279612 B6 19990111; TR 9701032 T1 19971221; TW 339384 B 19980901; US 6057255 A 20000502; WO 9727362 A1 19970731; ZA 9700598 B 19970808

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140125

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150126

2015-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150125

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 189016 T

- Effective date: 20150125

2015-09-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604227

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140126

2015-03-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150330

2015-01-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-12-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140725

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140125

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140125

2014-08-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-08-20 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-08-01 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20140725

2014-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CONRAD MUNZINGER & CIE A.G.

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140108

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131109

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-06-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130207

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-09-13 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2009-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144162 T3

2000-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000224

2000-04-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000314

2000-03-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604227 20000224

2000-02-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189016 T 20000215

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981207

1998-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970709

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE