Global patent index - EP 0786598 B1

EP 0786598 B1 2000-09-27 - Device for actuating a hydraulic user apparatus with an actuation speed that is independent of the resisting load affecting the hydraulic apparatus

Title (en)

Device for actuating a hydraulic user apparatus with an actuation speed that is independent of the resisting load affecting the hydraulic apparatus

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Betätigung einer hydraulischen Vorrichtung mit einer Betätigungsgeschwindigkeit, die unabhängig von der an der hydraulischen Vorrichtung wirkenden Last ist

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'actionnement d'un appareil hydraulique dont la vitesse est indépendante de la charge agissant sur l'appareil hydraulique

Publication

EP 0786598 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97100802 A

Priority

IT MI960117 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0786598A1] A hydraulic control device for the actuation of a hydraulic user apparatus with an actuation speed that is independent of the resisting load affecting the hydraulic user apparatus. The device comprises a double-acting pilot valve (1), which can be actuated so as to connect a user apparatus actuation branch (A, B) to a pressurized branch (P) of a hydraulic circuit and so as to connect the other user apparatus actuation branch (B, A) to a discharge branch (T) of the hydraulic circuit, and a pressure compensation unit (2), which is arranged on the pressurized branch (P) of the hydraulic circuit entering the pilot valve (1). The pilot valve (1) has: a first inlet (3) connected to the pressurized branch (P1) of the hydraulic circuit; at least one second inlet (4a, 4b) connected to the discharge branch (T) of the hydraulic circuit; a first outlet (5) connected to a first user apparatus actuation branch (A, B); a second outlet (6) connected to the second user apparatus actuation branch (A, B); a first outlet port (7) connected to a first monitoring duct (8); a second outlet port (9) connected to a second monitoring duct (10); a third outlet port (11) connected to a control duct (12) which is connected to the pressure compensation unit (2) to actuate it in contrast with the pressure along the pressurized branch (P) of the hydraulic circuit. The pilot valve (1) has a slider (15) movable on command into three positions: a first position, wherein the slider connects the first inlet (3) to the first outlet (5), to the first port (7), and to the third port (11) and the second inlet (4b) to the second outlet (6) and to the second port (9); a second position, wherein it connects the first inlet (3) to the second outlet (6), to the second port (9), and to the third port (11) and the second inlet (4a) to the first outlet (5) and to the first port (7); and a third position, or idle position, wherein it closes the first inlet (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 11/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/028 (2006.01); F15B 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/028 (2013.01); F15B 13/0417 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30535 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3122 (2013.01); F15B 2211/324 (2013.01); F15B 2211/50518 (2013.01); F15B 2211/5153 (2013.01); F15B 2211/55 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6054 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6055 (2013.01); F15B 2211/76 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0786598 A1 19970730; EP 0786598 B1 20000927; DE 69703166 D1 20001102; DE 69703166 T2 20010517; DK 0786598 T3 20001227; IT 1281708 B1 19980226; IT MI960117 A1 19970725; IT MI960117 D0 19960124

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-08-22 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

- Effective date: 20160131

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69703166

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2001-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-12-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703166

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-02

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK SE

1999-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991112

1998-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971222

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK SE