Global Patent Index - EP 0786629 B1

EP 0786629 B1 2003-06-04 - Power supply of broil and bake heating resistors for electric cookers

Title (en)

Power supply of broil and bake heating resistors for electric cookers

Title (de)

Stromversorgung von Heizwiderständen für Unter- und Oberhitze an elektrischen Haushaltherden

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation des résistances chauffantes de voute et de sole d'un four ménager électrique

Publication

EP 0786629 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400103 A

Priority

FR 9600948 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0786629A2] The circuit provides a supply for heating resistance elements (4,5) mounted in the top and bottom of an oven. The circuit includes a first control device (8) mounted in series with the heating resistance elements (4,5), and a second control device (23) mounted in series with the bottom heating element (5). A third control (35) is mounted in parallel with the first control device (8). The third control occupies a position in which operation of the heating elements is prevented, and a second closed position in which the elements are active during a timed interval (T1). The switching system provides operation both as a grill, using the top element, and an oven using both elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 7/08; F24C 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/06 (2006.01); F24C 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/087 (2013.01); F24C 7/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0786629 A2 19970730; EP 0786629 A3 19990303; EP 0786629 B1 20030604; DE 69722473 D1 20030710; DE 69722473 T2 20040506; ES 2200128 T3 20040301; FR 2744322 A1 19970801; FR 2744322 B1 19991231

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050121

2005-10-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-09-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050120

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-01-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050121

2005-01-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050120

2005-01-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050120

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200128 T3

2004-02-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040216

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-01-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040115

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-01-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040114

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-12-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031231

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69722473 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SEB S.A.

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020208

1999-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990903

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL