Global Patent Index - EP 0786641 B1

EP 0786641 B1 2000-09-13 - Composition of a gelatin capsule in a target marking projectile and manufacturing method of such a capsule

Title (en)

Composition of a gelatin capsule in a target marking projectile and manufacturing method of such a capsule

Title (de)

Zusammensetzung einer Gelatinekapselhülle in einem zielmarkierenden Geschoss und Herstellungsverfahren einer solchen Kapselhülle

Title (fr)

Composition d'une capsule à base de gélatine pour un projectile du type pour marquer le but et procédé de fabrication d'une telle capsule

Publication

EP 0786641 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97300052 A

Priority

GB 9601411 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0786641A1] A paintball projectile capable of marking a target comprises a soft elastic gelatin capsule shell encapsulating a liquid fill, and comprises a silicone oil content in at least one of the capsule shell and the liquid fill. Advantage: reduction of embrittlement of capsule wall. Furthermore, there is provided a method of manufacturing a projectile of this type which comprises mixing a silicone oil with at least one of the capsule shell or the liquid fill during manufacture, and further facilitating diffusion of the silicone oil across the capsule shell/fill boundary resulting in a silicone oil content retained in both the capsule shell and the fill.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 12/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/40 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

FR 2741434 A1 19970523 - GIAT IND SA [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0786641 A1 19970730; EP 0786641 B1 20000913; AU 1222197 A 19970731; AU 708023 B2 19990729; CA 2195716 A1 19970725; DE 69703051 D1 20001019; GB 2309509 A 19970730; GB 2309509 B 19981202; GB 9601411 D0 19960327

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020107

2002-01-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020107

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-01-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010104

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-12-14 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001214

2000-12-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703051 20001019

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-09-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-09-13 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-09-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000913

1999-12-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COMPOSITION OF A GELATIN CAPSULE IN A TARGET MARKING PROJECTILE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD OF SUCH A CAPSULE

1999-09-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COMPOSITION OF A GELATIN CAPSULE IN A TARGET MARKING PROJECTILE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD OF SUCH A CAPSULE

1999-08-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COMPOSITION OF A GELATIN CAPSULE IN A TARGET MARKING PROJECTILE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD OF SUCH A CAPSULE

1998-07-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980526

1998-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980409

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE