Global Patent Index - EP 0786714 B1

EP 0786714 B1 2002-11-20 - Method and apparatus for adjusting the intensity of a current or voltage controlled lighting means for rear lighting of a display device especially for motor vehicles

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for adjusting the intensity of a current or voltage controlled lighting means for rear lighting of a display device especially for motor vehicles

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung zur Einstellung der Helligkeit eines strom- oder spannungsgesteuerten Leuchtmittels zur Hinterleuchtung einer Anzeige, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de réglage d'intensité d'un moyen d'éclairage commandé en courant ou tension pour éclairage arrière d'un moyen d'affichage spécialement pour véhicules automobiles

Publication

EP 0786714 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96112912 A

Priority

DE 19602891 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0786714A2] The control is applied to a string of light-emitting diodes (LEDs) (1-3) with a series resistance (4), switched by a transistor (5) whose base drive is pulse-width modulated by a microprocessor (7) with nonvolatile electrically erasable programmable read-only memory (8) and a diagnostic interface (9). The brightness is monitored by a photometer (13) whose output is digitised (12) for the microprocessor. It is compared with a table in the memory which assigns a defined pulse width to each possible value of brightness.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05F 1/565; H05B 33/08; H05B 39/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/565 (2006.01); H05B 33/08 (2006.01); G09G 3/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/565 (2013.01); G09G 3/3406 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0786714 A2 19970730; EP 0786714 A3 19980624; EP 0786714 B1 20021120; DE 19602891 A1 19970807

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-15 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20051015

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-10-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PREH-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20030818

2003-09-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-05-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021120

2003-02-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609885 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010214

1999-01-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANNESMANN VDO AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1998-07-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980527

1998-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE