Global Patent Index - EP 0786816 B1

EP 0786816 B1 2003-06-18 - Bipolar transistor having an improved epitaxial base region and method of fabricating the same

Title (en)

Bipolar transistor having an improved epitaxial base region and method of fabricating the same

Title (de)

Bipolarer Transistor mit einer verbesserten epitaktischen Basiszone und dessen Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Transistor bipolare ayant une région de base épitaxiale améliorée et sa méthode de fabrication

Publication

EP 0786816 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97100686 A

Priority

JP 537896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0786816A2] A base region structure of a bipolar transistor is formed over both an epitaxial layer (2) having a first conductivity type and an insulation film (4). The base region structure comprises a single layer having a second conductivity type. The single layer comprises both an epitaxial portion (5) extending over said epitaxial layer (2) and a polycrystal portion (6) extending over said insulation film (4). An emitter region (14) is formed at an upper part of said epitaxial portion (5). The epitaxial portion (5) serves as a base region and the polycrystal portion (6) serves as a base plug lead. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 29/10; H01L 21/331; H01L 29/732

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 29/73 (2006.01); H01L 21/331 (2006.01); H01L 29/10 (2006.01); H01L 29/732 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 29/66287 (2013.01); H01L 29/1004 (2013.01); H01L 29/732 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

  • Silicon Processing for the VLSI Era, vol. 1, Lattice Press 1986, p. 264-266
  • Silicon Processing for the VLSI Era, vol. 2, Lattice Press 1990, p. 510-515

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0786816 A2 19970730; EP 0786816 A3 19980121; EP 0786816 B1 20030618; DE 69722833 D1 20030724; DE 69722833 T2 20040506; JP 2937253 B2 19990823; JP H09199510 A 19970731; US 5789800 A 19980804

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69722833

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TESSERA ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES, INC., SAN JOSE, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: RENESAS ELECTRONICS CORPORATION, KAWASAKI-SHI, KANAGAWA, JP

- Document: DE 69722833

- Effective date: 20140829

2014-10-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69722833

- Representative's name: GLAWE DELFS MOLL PARTNERSCHAFT MBB VON PATENT-, DE

- Effective date: 20140829

2014-08-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69722833

- Representative's name: GLAWE DELFS MOLL PARTNERSCHAFT MBB VON PATENT-, DE

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: RENESAS ELECTRONICS CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NEC ELECTRONICS CORP., KAWASAKI, JP

- Document: DE 69722833

- Effective date: 20120828

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TESSERA ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES, INC., SAN JOSE, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NEC ELECTRONICS CORP., KAWASAKI, KANAGAWA, JP

- Document: DE 69722833

- Effective date: 20120828

2012-10-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69722833

- Representative's name: GLAWE DELFS MOLL - PARTNERSCHAFT VON PATENT- U, DE

- Effective date: 20120828

2012-10-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69722833

- Representative's name: GLAWE DELFS MOLL PARTNERSCHAFT MBB VON PATENT-, DE

- Effective date: 20120828

2012-08-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69722833

- Representative's name: GLAWE DELFS MOLL - PARTNERSCHAFT VON PATENT- U, DE

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070801

2006-01-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060115

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69722833 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE NL

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEC COMPOUND SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES, LTD.

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990924

1998-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971208

1998-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE NL

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE NL