Global Patent Index - EP 0787014 A4

EP 0787014 A4 2001-01-10 - USE OF FLEA PROTEASES AND PROTEASE INHIBITORS TO PROTECT ANIMALS FROM FLEA INFESTATION

Title (en)

USE OF FLEA PROTEASES AND PROTEASE INHIBITORS TO PROTECT ANIMALS FROM FLEA INFESTATION

Title (de)

VERWENDUNGEN VON FLOHPROTEASEN UND PROTEASENHEMMERN ZUM TIERSCHUTZ VOR FLOHBEFALL

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DES PROTEASES DE LA PUCE ET D'INHIBITEURS DE PROTEASES POUR PROTEGER LES ANIMAUX DES INFESTATIONS PAR LES PUCES

Publication

EP 0787014 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95939081 A

Priority

  • US 9514442 W
  • US 32677394 A
  • US 48421195 A
  • US 48213095 A
  • US 48544395 A
  • US 48545595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9611706A1] The present invention relates to flea serine protease and aminopeptidase proteins; to flea serine protease and aminopeptidase nucleic acid molecules, including those that encode such proteins; to antibodies raised against such proteins; and to compounds that inhibit flea serine protease and/or aminopeptidase activities. The present invention also includes methods to obtain such proteins, nucleic acid molecules, antibodies, and inhibitors. Also included in the present invention are therapeutic compositions comprising such proteins, nucleic acid molecules, antibodies, and/or inhibitors as well as the use of such therapeutic compositions to protect a host animal from flea infestation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/52; C12N 9/64; C12N 9/48; A61K 38/46; A61K 38/57; A61K 39/00; A61K 39/395; C07K 16/40; C12N 7/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/573 (2006.01); A61K 9/08 (2006.01); A61K 35/64 (2006.01); A61K 38/46 (2006.01); A61K 38/48 (2006.01); A61K 39/35 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 47/30 (2006.01); A61P 33/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/435 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C07K 16/40 (2006.01); C12N 7/00 (2006.01); C12N 9/48 (2006.01); C12N 9/64 (2006.01); C12N 9/99 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); A61K 35/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/6408 (2013.01); C07K 16/40 (2013.01); C12N 9/48 (2013.01); C12N 9/641 (2013.01); C12N 9/6424 (2013.01); C12N 9/6472 (2013.01); A61K 35/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] WO 9311790 A1 19930624 - PARAVAX INC [US]
  • [XYA] DATABASE BIOSIS BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US; SHCHEDRIN V.I. ET AL.,: "BLOOD DIGESTION AND PLAGUE BLOK FORMATION IN FLEAS CERATOPHYLLUS-TESQUORUM", XP002143759
  • [XYA] DATABASE BIOSIS BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US; BRYUKHANOVA L.V. ET AL.,: "DIGESTION OF BLOOD BY THE FLEA LEPTOPSYLLA-SEGNIS", XP002143760
  • [XYA] DATABASE BIOSIS BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US; SHCHEDRIN V.I. ET AL.,: "HISTOENZYMATIC ANALYSIS OF FLEAS", XP002143761
  • [XYA] DATABASE BIOSIS BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US; RIDDOCH B.J. ET AL.,: "ASPECTS OF THE POPULATION STRUCTURE OF THE SAND MARTIN FLEA CERATOPHYLLUS-STYX IN BRITAIN UK", XP002143762
  • [Y] MULLER M.H. ET AL.,: "Members of a trypsin gene family in Anopheles gambiae are induced in the gut by blood meal", EMBO J., vol. 12, no. 7, July 1993 (1993-07-01), pages 2891 - 2900, XP000919311
  • [A] SMITH W.A. ET AL.,: "Cloning and sequencing of the Dermatophagoides pteronyssinus group III allergen, Der p III.", CLIN. EXP. ALLERGY, vol. 24, no. 3, March 1994 (1994-03-01), pages 220 - 228, XP000917275
  • See also references of WO 9611706A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9611706 A1 19960425; AU 4103896 A 19960506; AU 705715 B2 19990527; CA 2202622 A1 19960425; EP 0787014 A1 19970806; EP 0787014 A4 20010110; IL 115671 D0 19960119; JP H10507455 A 19980721; MX 9702776 A 19980731; NZ 296424 A 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030503

2001-01-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001123

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 15/52 A, 7C 12N 9/64 B, 7C 12N 9/48 B, 7A 61K 38/46 B, 7A 61K 38/57 B, 7A 61K 39/00 B, 7A 61K 39/395 B, 7C 07K 16/40 B, 7C 12N 7/01 B

1997-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970515

1997-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE