Global Patent Index - EP 0787096 B1

EP 0787096 B1 2001-05-23 - METHOD AND SYSTEMS FOR CONTROLLING THE SERVICE FOR AN AIRCRAFT

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEMS FOR CONTROLLING THE SERVICE FOR AN AIRCRAFT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER WARTUNG EINES FLUGZEUGES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEMES DE GESTION DES OPERATIONS DE RAVITAILLEMENT ET D'ENTRETIEN D'UN AERONEF

Publication

EP 0787096 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95936142 A

Priority

  • SE 9501098 W
  • SE 9403605 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9612643A1] In a method and a device for controlling the servicing of an aircraft parked at a stand, the servicing is carried out from a plurality of servicing units which are stationarily arranged adjacent to the stand and which each are adapted to supply fuel, water, compressed air, preconditioned air or electric power to the aircraft or to service the toilets of the aircraft. A plurality of local computer units are each disposed in a servicing unit and have an associated display as well as an associated inputting device. A central computer unit is connected to each of the local computer units and to an information receiver in or in the vicinity of the aircraft. The central computer unit transmits information to the local computer units of the servicing units on the servicing to be carried out. Each of the local computer units records information on the servicing carried out and transmits this information to the central computer unit, which in turn transmits the information to the information receiver.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B64F 1/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B64F 1/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B64F 1/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9612643 A1 19960502; AU 3818795 A 19960515; DE 69521052 D1 20010628; DE 69521052 T2 20011025; EP 0787096 A1 19970806; EP 0787096 B1 20010523; ES 2156949 T3 20010801; SE 9403605 D0 19941020; US 6119058 A 20000912

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150925

2015-10-21 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150925

2015-09-26 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69521052

2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130927

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140911

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140904

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140916

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140903

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20141007

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130926

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120914

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156949 T3

2001-06-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI S.P.A.

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69521052 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000817

1997-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970422

1997-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE