Global patent index - EP 0787099 B1

EP 0787099 B1 2000-01-05 - DEVICE FOR AIRING A LIQUIDS CONTAINER

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR AIRING A LIQUIDS CONTAINER

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUR BELÜFTUNG EINES FLÜSSIGKEITSBEHÄLTERS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE MISE A L'AIR LIBRE POUR RECIPIENT CONTENANT UN LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 0787099 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96926313 A

Priority

  • CH 9600291 W
  • CH 239195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CH687696A5] A container (1) that serves to hold and pour liquids has an airing device (5) that can be integrated in the fill/pour opening (4) and that has in the mouth region of the fill/pour opening (4) angled tube segments (9, 10) of an air tube, of which one (9) connects to the space outside the container (1) and the other (10) extends into the container region away from the fill/pour opening (4), into the hollow space (11) of the container (1), and terminates in a stop valve (14) that can be acted upon by the liquid (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 25/48; B65D 25/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/38 (2006.01); B65D 25/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/38 (2013.01); B65D 25/48 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

CH 687696 A5 19970131; AT 188433 T 20000115; DE 59604112 D1 20000210; EP 0787099 A1 19970806; EP 0787099 B1 20000105; US 5853114 A 19981229; WO 9708068 A1 19970306

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070822

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070822

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050809

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070822

2006-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-12 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000822

2000-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000404

2000-04-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ZANELLA & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59604112

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000210

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB IT LI SE

2000-01-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 188433

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000115

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1998-06-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980507

1997-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970602

1997-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB IT LI SE