Global Patent Index - EP 0787237 B1

EP 0787237 B1 2001-05-30 - FOLDING SCREEN

Title (en)

FOLDING SCREEN

Title (de)

FALTBARE TRENNWAND

Title (fr)

PAROI PLIANTE

Publication

EP 0787237 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95935632 A

Priority

  • SE 9501183 W
  • SE 9403552 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9612073A1] An arrangement for interconnecting such folding screen elements (1, 2) as comprise oppositely facing screen wall surfaces (3, 20) which are united by edge surfaces (4) extending along the edges of the folding screen elements is provided with pivot means in the region of the vertical edge surfaces (4) of the folding screen elements (1, 2) for pivotal interconnection of adjacent folding screen elements (1, 2). Each pivot means includes at least two pivot elements on each one of two mutually adjacent folding screen elements (1, 2). The pivot elements are located at opposing corner regions between an edge surface (4) and an adjacent screen wall surface (3, 20). Corresponding pivot elements on the adjacent folding screen elements are interconnectible for the formation of a pivot between the adjacent folding screen elements. The pivot elements are provided with cogged portions (12) with cogs (13) which extend slightly outside parts of the edge surface (4) located in the corner region, and the screen wall surface (3, 20) and which engage with and roll against one another.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/7431 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9612073 A1 19960425; AU 3757495 A 19960506; DE 69521139 D1 20010705; DE 69521139 T2 20010927; DK 0787237 T3 20010730; EP 0787237 A1 19970806; EP 0787237 B1 20010530; NO 309053 B1 20001204; NO 971664 A 19970411; NO 971664 D0 19970411; SE 504505 C2 19970224; SE 9403552 D0 19941018; SE 9403552 L 19960419

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-07 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2004-06-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031013

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KINNARPS A.B.

- Effective date: 20031031

2004-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2003-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031013

2002-12-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021220

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-22 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20021022

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-07 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021007

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021001

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-07-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69521139 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB SE

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990609

1997-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970520

1997-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB SE